THE GALTRES CENTRE CHARITY

Charity number: 1167301
Charity reporting is up to date (10 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 February 2021 10 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 February 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 February 2019 1 days late Download
Annual return 01 October 2016 09 February 2018 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2016 Not Required