THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, BURGESS HILL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work including visiting the sick and the bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. The provision of a youth club with a Christian ethos. Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events and meetings, and the distribution of literature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 14 January 2016: Previously excepted registration
- ST JOHN'S CHURCH, BURGESS HILL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KARIN FORD | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Knowles | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Sanford | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Denise Court | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN VINCENT ELLIOT | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANN GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM ZIMMERMANN | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev David Gordon CHARLES | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
JEAN NORA HELGA MacCARTHY | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev STEPHEN SAMUEL MacCARTHY | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
DIANA JANE TIPLER | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Jane Nicholls | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM DAVID VICKERS TODD | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
COLIN ROBERT SQUIRES | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS ALEXANDER STEWART | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY NEIL BURTON FCCA | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||
JOHN BERNARD CARTER | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|||||
CLAIRE THERESA ELLIOT | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.17k | £99.22k | £88.84k | £94.76k | £139.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.42k | £93.35k | £89.52k | £105.61k | £127.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.23k | £6.81k | £1.28k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOWER CHURCH ROAD
BURGESS HILL
WEST SUSSEX
RH15 9AA
- Phone:
- 01444230499
- Email:
- stjohnsbh.admin@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window