Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, BURGESS HILL

Charity number: 1165166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev STEPHEN SAMUEL MacCARTHY Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
JEAN NORA HELGA MacCARTHY Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
DIANA JANE TIPLER Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Virginia Jane Nicholls Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Sonia Elizabeth Hayward Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
GEOFFREY NEIL BURTON FCCA Trustee 07 April 2019
THE TERRYS CROSS TRUST
Received: On time
THE TERRYS CROSS TRUST
Received: On time
Carol Butler Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
KAY WINIFRED RHODES Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
COLIN ROBERT SQUIRES Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
DOUGLAS ALEXANDER STEWART Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
EDGAR ROY HORN JP Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
GRAHAM DAVID VICKERS TODD Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
JOHN BERNARD CARTER Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
Luke Heron Corkill Trustee 07 April 2019
None on record
STUART ROGER BECKETT Trustee 15 April 2018
8TH BURGESS HILL (ST EDWARD'S) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
CLAIRE THERESA ELLIOT Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record
AVERIL MARY WEST Trustee 15 April 2018
None on record