Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MICHAEL, BREASTON

Charity number: 1165581
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 07 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window