Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MICHAEL, BREASTON
Charity number: 1165581
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS SMEDLEY | Chair | 01 January 2005 |
|
|||||
Rachel Deborah Lacey | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Jane Knighton | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Huskisson | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Edward Lees | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Warburton | Trustee | 14 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Elizabeth Long | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen William Bowley | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robert Lacey | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ben Gooding | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
COLIN HAROLD LOWE | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEANNE CHERYL WILSON M.ED | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CHARLES STUTTLE | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Adam Grant Collishaw | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.