Financial history WELFARE BENEFITS UNIT

Charity number: 1164225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £177.96k £171.90k £171.90k £177.09k £181.92k
Total expenditure £176.82k £159.66k £179.59k £194.67k £188.92k
Income from government contracts £102.00k £102.00k £102.00k £102.00k £102.00k
Income from government grants £22.70k £34.47k £33.61k £25.20k £36.60k