Accounts and annual returns FAMILY FIRST

Charity number: 1166175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 21 March 2017 04 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 21 March 2017 04 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window