Accounts and annual returns THE ODDBALLS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164815
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 29 August 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 29 August 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 09 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 09 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 09 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 09 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 13 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 13 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 30 September 2019 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 30 September 2019 30 days late Download Open in new window