COASTLANDS LOCAL HISTORY GROUP (CIO)

Charity number: 1164339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 September 2017 On time Download