Financial history COASTLANDS LOCAL HISTORY GROUP (CIO)

Charity number: 1164339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.90k £1.12k £8.46k £12.33k £237
Total expenditure £1.04k £2.18k £3.17k £2.33k £1.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £11.00k N/A