PIRPEL TRUST

Charity number: 1165436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 30 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 30 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 19 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 19 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 05 July 2020 309 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 05 July 2020 309 days late Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 22 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 28 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 03 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 03 April 2017 On time Download