Trustees CHISWELL GREEN U3A
Charity number: 1165924
Charity reporting is up to date (26 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Michael Wilson | Chair | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Margaret Jordan | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Needham Duggan | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Nicole Lintern | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Victor Smith | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Brennan | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Mary Gerwien | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Jackson | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Martin | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARILYN JOY DABSON | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE ADRIAN NORMAN SMITH | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.