Accounts and annual returns KEEP BREAGE GREEN

Charity number: 1166147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 08 May 2017 On time Download Open in new window