LEIGH PARK COMMUNITY CENTRE (WESTBURY)

Charity number: 1164413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £48.94k £43.10k £49.58k £83.72k £95.20k
Total expenditure £47.17k £42.83k £54.39k £84.28k £95.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £2.07k £400 £20.53k