THE INTERNATIONAL FEDERATION OF AROMATHERAPISTS

Charity number: 1165766
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 June 2017 On time Download