WHITCHURCH (CARDIFF) COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1165385
Charity reporting is overdue by 231 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 231 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 231 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 March 2020 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 March 2020 45 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 March 2020 410 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 16 March 2020 410 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 06 March 2020 765 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 06 March 2020 765 days late Download