Accounts and annual returns ENABLE LEISURE AND CULTURE

Charity number: 1172345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 25 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 08 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 28 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 28 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window