BARFORD YOUTH & COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1166022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 15 January 2018 On time Download