THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD HOLY GHOST ZONE NORWICH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity organise seminars and events with proven speakers and ministers of the faith to guide members in the various aspects of the Christian faith; and support for other charities and Christian Events. Also do community outreach events, Provision of welfare support to members, Provision to support other charities, Conferences and Events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Norfolk
Governance
- 22 August 2016: Standard registration
- RCCG HOLY GHOST ZONE NORWICH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EJIRO RICHARD OBAHOR | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Adewale Oladunjoye | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
MR OLATUNJI OLALETE USMAN | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.54k | £63.24k | £59.30k | £65.57k | £238.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.11k | £53.80k | £53.27k | £55.84k | £62.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 November 2020 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 MAY 2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT ("THE OBJECT") WHICH IS TO BE CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE;
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 Eastern Road
Watton
THETFORD
Norfolk
IP25 6PA
- Phone:
- 01603788939
- Email:
- pastor@hgzn.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window