ST CUTHBERT'S SOCIETY JUNIOR COMMON ROOM

Charity number: 1168134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Keely Brown Trustee 01 August 2021 None on record
Neave Taylor Trustee 01 August 2021 None on record
Serge Thomas Albert Chapman Trustee 19 April 2020 None on record
Alfred Joseph Chamberlin Whillis DIB Trustee 01 August 2021 None on record
Sean Barnett Trustee 03 May 2019 None on record
Glenn Charles Henry Holmwood Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record
Stephanie Kate Root BA ACA Trustee 07 December 2020 None on record
Thomas Gareth Fletcher-Manuel Chair 23 February 2020 None on record
Benjamin Thomas Trustee 01 August 2021 None on record
Chiedza Mhondoro Trustee 01 October 2020 None on record