DEAN ROAD CHAPEL LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. To conserve, preserve and improve for the public benefit Dean Road Chapel, Dean Road Cemetery, Scarborough as a building of historic interest. 2. The provision and maintenance of Dean Road Chapel, Dean Road Cemetery, Scarborough as a community facility for the use of the inhabitants of Scarborough without distinction of political, religious or other opinions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 January 2017: Standard registration
- 09 January 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 09 January 2025: Funds transferred to 1209559 THE FRIENDS OF DEAN ROAD AND MANOR ROAD CEMETERY C...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.35k | £13.39k | £648 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.87k | £11.06k | £3.86k | £1.00k | £892 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.02k | £9.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 07 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 02 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 OCT 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO CONSERVE, PRESERVE AND IMPROVE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT DEAN ROAD CHAPEL, DEAN ROAD CEMETERY, SCARBOROUGH AS A BUILDING OF HISTORIC INTEREST. 2. THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF DEAN ROAD CHAPEL, DEAN ROAD CEMETERY, SCARBOROUGH AS A COMMUNITY FACILITY FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF SCARBOROUGH WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR: A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES; AND B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window