Accounts and annual returns SEDGEFIELD CIVIC TRUST

Charity number: 507144
Charity reporting is overdue by 167 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 167 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 167 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2023 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required