Trustees ABBOTSWOOD COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1166969
Charity reporting is up to date (80 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Robert Russell Chair 19 April 2017
None on record
Ian Wilcox Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record
Thomas Wood Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record
Tony Brown Trustee 24 July 2020
None on record
Rohit Kohli Trustee 06 January 2020
None on record
Mark Welch Trustee 07 October 2017
None on record