Trustees GURYOSAMO INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity number: 1166589
Charity reporting is overdue by 1490 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
YAHYA ABDI ALI Chair 01 November 2015
None on record
DUALEH ADAN FARAH Trustee 31 October 2017
None on record
FARHIA ALI ELMI Trustee 18 February 2017
None on record
ASHA MOHAMED HASHI Trustee 20 February 2016
None on record
OMER MOHMOOD SULIMAN Trustee 08 November 2015
None on record