Financial history SUPPORTING HOMELESS, ASSISTING REFUGEES EVERYWHERE

Charity number: 1166530
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £102.40k £76.82k £123.89k £90.33k £102.85k
Total expenditure £51.54k £31.56k £62.09k £69.87k £78.24k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A