Trustees SUPPORTING HOMELESS, ASSISTING REFUGEES EVERYWHERE

Charity number: 1166530
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM ANDREW DEVLIN Chair 01 April 2019
None on record
Paul Geffrey Makinson Trustee 01 June 2019
None on record
Rachel Adams Trustee 07 May 2019
None on record
Christine Champion Trustee 17 May 2018
None on record
ADAM DANDY Trustee 09 March 2016
None on record