ALLEVIATE CHARITY UK

Charity number: 1170768
Charity reporting is overdue by 239 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 239 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 239 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 February 2020 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 February 2020 21 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 February 2020 379 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 February 2020 379 days late Download