Financial history HEYROD RESIDENTS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 507181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £5.01k £9.10k £8.57k £4.73k £3.57k
Total expenditure £4.76k £5.56k £9.20k £9.56k £3.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A