Trustees CHANDOS & DENT'S ALMSHOUSES
Charity number: 1168158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR MARTIN TREVOR RICHARD BLACKWELL PHD | Chair | 20 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mark Tonkin | Trustee | 06 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Catherine Buckingham | Trustee | 08 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Miller | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Buchanan | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Marriott | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Norman Clive Carter | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Elizabeth Spice | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Derek Hill | Trustee | 20 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Brenda May Cove | Trustee | 20 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Heather Elizabeth Simonds | Trustee | 20 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.