Accounts and annual returns REDEEMER CHURCH COLCHESTER

Charity number: 1165450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 January 2018 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 January 2018 79 days late Download Open in new window