YORK RI

Charity number: 1165513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 April 2019 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 March 2018 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download