YORK RI

Charity number: 1165513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SAMUEL STOW Trustee 19 April 2016 None on record
Lisa Hammond Trustee 24 September 2020 None on record
Stephen Leonard Atkinson Trustee 07 January 2019 None on record
DAVID CHAPMAN Trustee 10 February 2016 None on record
HUGH BRAZIER Trustee 22 August 2016 None on record
Heather Robertson Trustee 09 July 2020 None on record
Dermot Heslop Trustee 07 January 2019 None on record
PETER HOPE Trustee 10 February 2016 None on record
BRIAN SMITH Trustee 10 February 2016 None on record
SEAN HESLOP Chair 24 January 2018 None on record
Christopher Smith Trustee 29 September 2020 None on record
GRANVILLE MILLER Trustee 24 January 2018 None on record