THE PARISH OF PONTYPRIDD PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity number: 1165251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Gulliford Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
Elaine Rees Trustee 15 November 2020 None on record
DAVID RICHARD POWER CARVER Trustee 28 September 2015 None on record
Rev Peter Watson Trustee 27 June 2020 None on record
BARBARA MINTON Trustee 28 September 2015 None on record
David Roger Morgan Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
Christine Mary Godfrey Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
Rev Charlotte Rushton Trustee 05 May 2021 None on record
GLYNIS LLOYD Trustee 28 September 2015 None on record
Rev MICHAEL DAVID GABLE Trustee 28 September 2015
THE LLANDAFF DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
BRENDA CAWTHORNE Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
SHEILA ANN DAVIES Chair 15 April 2018
RHONDDA WARD OLD AGE WELFARE ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Jude Bevan Trustee 03 July 2018 None on record
David Tazzini-Lloyd Trustee 28 September 2015 None on record
Dr GEOFFREY LLOYD Trustee 18 April 2021
PARTNERSHIPS OVERSEAS NETWORKING TRUST Received: On time
PONTYPRIDD CHRISTIAN CONCERN Received: On time
PARTNERSHIPS OVERSEAS NETWORKING TRUST Received: On time
Philip John Hopkins Trustee 15 November 2020 None on record
William Keith Johns Trustee 18 April 2021 None on record
Sheila Majorie Nurse Trustee 12 July 2017 None on record
Sara Fowler Trustee 15 April 2018 None on record
Ray Minton Trustee 19 November 2015 None on record
NEAL PHILIP WOOD Trustee 28 September 2015 None on record