THE SCHOOL BUS PROJECT

Charity number: 1166972
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 04 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download