BAREFOOT OPERA

Charity number: 1167730
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Olivia Shaw Trustee 07 January 2021 None on record
Virginia Gilbert Trustee 17 August 2017 None on record
Charles Neal Trustee 07 January 2021 None on record
FENELLA VALERIE JANE MCVEY Trustee 15 June 2015 None on record
Joao Figueiredo Trustee 10 September 2021 None on record
Dr DIANA FRANCES BICKLEY Chair 15 June 2015 None on record
Avril Crawford Trustee 15 January 2021 None on record
BARBARA ANNE BROWNING Trustee 15 June 2015 None on record