Accounts and annual returns HAVERING MUSIC MAKERS

Charity number: 1170955
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 15 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 August 2023 24 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 11 August 2024 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 13 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 15 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 06 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required