THE TERRIER TRUST CIO

Charity number: 1165782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 13 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 13 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 07 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 07 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 27 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 04 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 04 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2017 16 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 16 October 2017 On time Download