Accounts and annual returns PETT LEVEL PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1164637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 05 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 05 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 21 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 November 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 13 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window