Accounts and annual returns WORLD YOUTH ORGANIZATION

Charity number: 1165035
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 July 2022 07 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 July 2022 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 04 January 2021 03 January 2022 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2021 03 January 2022 60 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 January 2020 02 January 2022 424 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2020 02 January 2022 424 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 January 2019 02 January 2022 790 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2019 02 January 2022 790 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 January 2018 11 January 2019 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 January 2018 11 January 2019 68 days late Download Open in new window