Financial history WORLD YOUTH ORGANIZATION

Charity number: 1165035
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/01/2018 04/01/2019 04/01/2020 04/01/2021 04/07/2022
Total gross income £12.91k £10.00k £0 £0 £1.07k
Total expenditure £12.73k £10.02k £0 £0 £840
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A