Financial history ST FRANCIS', VALLEY PARK SINGLE CONGREGATION LOCAL ECUMENICAL PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1165677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £104.16k £108.34k £121.33k £117.58k £140.06k
Total expenditure £110.97k £101.09k £113.08k £114.56k £122.06k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k N/A £373 £100 N/A