Financial history LOVE'S FARM COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity number: 1165671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £18.57k £14.76k £15.16k £15.96k £18.80k
Total expenditure £16.40k £16.63k £15.72k £13.22k £19.51k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £999 N/A N/A