Trustees HOPE FOR SOUTHALL STREET HOMELESS

Charity number: 1164674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALMA PATTERSON Trustee 23 February 2021
THE KINGS CENTRE SOUTHALL
Received: On time
Francisco Xavier D'Souza Trustee 01 May 2020
None on record
SUSAN ANNE CAWLEY Trustee 11 January 2019
None on record
John Coleby Trustee 01 December 2016
None on record
Rev MICHAEL FRANCIS BOLLEY Trustee 27 November 2015
DELOITTE'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
NAVRAJ SINGH Trustee 27 November 2015
SRI GURU SINGH SABHA SOUTHALL
Overdue by 28 days