Accounts and annual returns ROYAL WINDERMERE YACHT CLUB SAILING ACADEMY CIO

Charity number: 1166341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 22 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 31 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window