Financial history ROYAL WINDERMERE YACHT CLUB SAILING ACADEMY CIO

Charity number: 1166341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £6.43k £0 £5.32k £50 £10
Total expenditure £3.19k £11.89k £862 £7.50k £929
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A