Accounts and annual returns THE FOUNDATION OF SAINT FRANÇOIS

Charity number: 1165715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 18 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 18 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 02 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 15 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 15 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2017 27 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required