Accounts and annual returns PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PENDLETON & CLAREMONT

Charity number: 1165386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 10 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 09 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window