Financial history MAECYMRU MERCHED A'R EGLWYS

Charity number: 1165832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £2.65k £1.97k £1.52k £759 £630
Total expenditure £1.40k £2.46k £983 £101 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A