CANTERBURY STREET PASTORS

Charity number: 1164627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £16.83k £12.05k £8.07k £36.42k £4.15k
Total expenditure £11.12k £8.27k £7.73k £13.51k £12.90k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A