Al-Arafa Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) To Promote for the benefit of the area of Elmbridge Borough in Surrey and the London Borough of Tower Hamlets by: a) The Advancement of Education and Training;b) The Relief of Poverty, Sickness and Distress; c) The Preservation and Protection of Good Health d) The Provision of Recreational facilities. 2) To Relieve Financial Hardship amongst people in Bangladesh via grants and donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Surrey
- Tower Hamlets
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 11 April 2016: Standard registration
- AAF (Working name)
- ARAFAH AID FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mdjakar Chowdhury | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
TAJUL QURESI | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
TIPU CHOWDHURY | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.97k | £69.40k | £20.25k | £16.64k | £6.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.09k | £51.45k | £17.99k | £12.99k | £15.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 February 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 JUL 2015 as amended on 20 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE AREA OF ELMBRIDGE BOROUGH IN SURREY AND THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS BY: A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; C) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH; AND D) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2 TO RELIEVE OF PREVENT FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN BANGLADESH, PARTICULARLY THOSE LIVING IN THE SYLHET DISTRICT, BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH GRANTS AND DONATIONS AS SHALL BE THOUGHT FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Mole Road
Hersham
Walton-on-Thames
KT12 4LU
- Phone:
- 07862720533
- Email:
- info.alarafa7@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window